# Multiplying -digit Numbers Worksheet Test

Answer the following questions by multiplying the given numbers.

- 46 x 73 =
- 89 x 23 =
- 567 x 98 =
- 734 x 12 =
- 345 x 67 =
- 987 x 56 =
- 234 x 789 =
- 678 x 56 =
- 345 x 432 =
- 789 x 123 =

Calculate the following products.

Serial No. | Multiplication |
---|---|

1 | 67 x 89 |

2 | 123 x 456 |

3 | 345 x 678 |

4 | 987 x 543 |

5 | 234 x 567 |

6 | 789 x 321 |

7 | 456 x 789 |

8 | 876 x 234 |

9 | 432 x 567 |

10 | 789 x 345 |

Solve the following word problems.

- A farmer has 567 acres of land. If he divides it into 89 equal parts, how many acres will each part have?
- A company has to package 3456 boxes. If they can pack 78 boxes in a carton, how many cartons will they need?
- A school has 678 students. If they are divided into 9 classes with equal number of students, how many students will be in each class?
- A store has 2342 shirts. If each shirt costs $56, what will be the total cost of all the shirts?
- A factory produces 3456 toys in one day. If they work for 8 hours, how many toys are produced in an hour?
- A park has 789 trees. If they are equally spaced with 12 feet between each tree, what is the total length of the park in feet?
- A company has 456 employees. If they have to distribute 876 paychecks, how many employees will share one paycheck?
- A magazine has 567 pages. If each issue has 34 pages, how many issues can be made from this magazine?
- A car travels at a speed of 45 miles per hour. How much time will it take to cover 234 miles?
- A company has to package 5678 boxes. If they can pack 12 boxes in a carton, how many cartons will they need?

Find the product of the following numbers.

- 23, 12, 45, 67
- 56, 34, 89, 23
- 76, 45, 34, 21
- 98, 76, 54, 32
- 45, 67, 89, 23
- 12, 34, 56, 78
- 21, 43, 65, 87
- 98, 76, 54, 32
- 34, 56, 78, 90
- 56, 78, 90, 12

Multiply the following numbers.

- 567 x 2
- 789 x 3
- 345 x 4
- 234 x 5
- 678 x 6
- 123 x 7
- 456 x 8
- 876 x 9
- 432 x 10
- 789 x 11

Calculate the following products.

Serial No. | Multiplication |
---|---|

1 | 12 x 34 x 56 |

2 | 23 x 45 x 67 |

3 | 34 x 56 x 78 |

4 | 45 x 67 x 89 |

5 | 56 x 78 x 90 |

6 | 67 x 89 x 12 |

7 | 78 x 90 x 12 |

8 | 89 x 12 x 34 |

9 | 90 x 12 x 56 |

10 | 12 x 34 x 56 x 78 |

Multiply the following numbers.

- 5678 x 1
- 2345 x 2
- 6789 x 3
- 3456 x 4
- 7890 x 5
- 1234 x 6
- 4567 x 7
- 8901 x 8
- 4321 x 9
- 4567 x 10

Calculate the following products.

Serial No. | Multiplication |
---|---|

1 | 11 x 12 x 13 x 14 |

2 | 15 x 16 x 17 x 18 |

3 | 19 x 20 x 21 x 22 |

4 | 23 x 24 x 25 x 26 |

5 | 27 x 28 x 29 x 30 |

6 | 31 x 32 x 33 x 34 |

7 | 35 x 36 x 37 x 38 |

8 | 39 x 40 x 41 x 42 |

9 | 43 x 44 x 45 x 46 |

10 | 47 x 48 x 49 x 50 |